Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB263 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona, Zaffirini S.B. No. 263
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2008; February 11, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 17, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 17, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 263 By: Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance by the Texas Transportation Commission of
 general obligation bonds for highway improvement projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 222, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 222.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 222.004.  ISSUANCE OF GENERAL OBLIGATION BONDS FOR
 HIGHWAY IMPROVEMENT PROJECTS. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Bonds" means bonds, notes, and other public
 securities.
 (2)  "Credit agreement" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 1371.001, Government Code.
 (3)  "Improvement" includes acquisition of the
 highway, construction, reconstruction, and major maintenance,
 including any necessary design, and the acquisition of
 rights-of-way.
 (b)  The commission by order or resolution may issue general
 obligation bonds for the purposes provided in this section. The
 aggregate principal amount of the bonds that are issued may not
 exceed the amount specified by Section 49-p(a), Article III, Texas
 Constitution.
 (c)  The commission may enter into credit agreements
 relating to the bonds. A credit agreement entered into under this
 section may be secured by and payable from the same sources as the
 bonds.
 (d)  The bonds shall be executed in the form, on the terms,
 and in the denominations, bear interest, and be issued in
 installments as prescribed by the commission, and must mature not
 later than 30 years after their dates of issuance, subject to any
 refundings or renewals. The bonds may be issued in multiple series
 and issues from time to time and may have the provisions the
 commission determines appropriate and in the interest of the state.
 (e)  The commission has all powers necessary or appropriate
 to carry out this section and to implement Section 49-p, Article
 III, Texas Constitution, including the powers granted to other
 bond-issuing governmental agencies and units and to nonprofit
 corporations by Chapters 1201, 1207, and 1371, Government Code.
 (f)  The bonds and the record of proceedings authorizing the
 bonds and any related credit agreements shall be submitted to the
 attorney general for approval as to their legality.  If the attorney
 general finds that they will be issued in accordance with this
 section and other applicable law, the attorney general shall
 approve them, and, after payment by the purchasers of the
 obligations in accordance with the terms of sale and after
 execution and delivery of the related credit agreements, the
 obligations and related credit agreements are incontestable for any
 cause.
 (g)  Bonds may be issued for one or more of the following
 purposes:
 (1)  to pay all or part of the costs of highway
 improvement projects;
 (2) to pay:
 (A)  the costs of administering projects
 authorized under this section;
 (B)  the cost or expense of the issuance of the
 bonds; or
 (C)  all or part of a payment owed or to be owed
 under a credit agreement; and
 (3)  to provide money for deposit in the Texas
 Transportation Revolving Fund or similar revolving fund authorized
 by law, to be used for the purpose of making loans for highway
 improvement projects as provided by law.
 (h)  The proceeds from the issuance and sale of the bonds may
 not be expended or used for the purposes authorized under this
 section unless those proceeds have been appropriated by the
 legislature.
 (i)  The comptroller shall pay the principal of the bonds as
 they mature and the interest as it becomes payable and shall pay any
 cost related to the bonds that becomes due, including payments
 under credit agreements.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *