Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB28 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 28


 AN ACT
 relating to the use of a computer for an unauthorized purpose;
 providing a civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 324.002, Business & Commerce Code, as
 effective April 1, 2009, is amended by adding Subdivisions (1-a)
 and (9) to read as follows:
 (1-a)  "Botnet" means a collection of two or more
 zombies.
 (9)  "Zombie" means a computer that, without the
 knowledge and consent of the computer's owner or operator, has been
 compromised to give access or control to a program or person other
 than the computer's owner or operator.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 324.003, Business &
 Commerce Code, as effective April 1, 2009, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (a) Section 324.052, other than Subdivision (1) of that
 section, and Sections 324.053(4), [and] 324.054, and 324.055 do not
 apply to a telecommunications carrier, cable operator, computer
 hardware or software provider, or provider of information service
 or interactive computer service that monitors or has interaction
 with a subscriber's Internet or other network connection or service
 or a protected computer for:
 (1) a network or computer security purpose;
 (2) diagnostics, technical support, or a repair
 purpose;
 (3) an authorized update of computer software or
 system firmware;
 (4) authorized remote system management; or
 (5) detection or prevention of unauthorized use of or
 fraudulent or other illegal activity in connection with a network,
 service, or computer software, including scanning for and removing
 software proscribed under this chapter.
 SECTION 3. Section 324.005, Business & Commerce Code, as
 effective April 1, 2009, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 324.005. KNOWING VIOLATION. A person knowingly
 violates Section 324.051, 324.052, [or] 324.053, or 324.055 if the
 person:
 (1) acts with actual knowledge of the facts that
 constitute the violation; or
 (2) consciously avoids information that would
 establish actual knowledge of those facts.
 SECTION 4. Subchapter B, Chapter 324, Business & Commerce
 Code, as effective April 1, 2009, is amended by adding Section
 324.055 to read as follows:
 Sec. 324.055.  UNAUTHORIZED CREATION OF, ACCESS TO, OR USE
 OF ZOMBIES OR BOTNETS; PRIVATE ACTION. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Internet service provider" means a person
 providing connectivity to the Internet or another wide area
 network.
 (2)  "Person" has the meaning assigned by Section
 311.005, Government Code.
 (b)  A person who is not the owner or operator of the computer
 may not knowingly cause or offer to cause a computer to become a
 zombie or part of a botnet.
 (c)  A person may not knowingly create, have created, use, or
 offer to use a zombie or botnet to:
 (1)  send an unsolicited commercial electronic mail
 message, as defined by Section 321.001;
 (2)  send a signal to a computer system or network that
 causes a loss of service to users;
 (3)  send data from a computer without authorization by
 the owner or operator of the computer;
 (4)  forward computer software designed to damage or
 disrupt another computer or system;
 (5) collect personally identifiable information; or
 (6)  perform an act for another purpose not authorized
 by the owner or operator of the computer.
 (d) A person may not:
 (1)  purchase, rent, or otherwise gain control of a
 zombie or botnet created by another person; or
 (2)  sell, lease, offer for sale or lease, or otherwise
 provide to another person access to or use of a zombie or botnet.
 (e)  The following persons may bring a civil action against a
 person who violates this section:
 (1)  a person who is acting as an Internet service
 provider and whose network is used to commit a violation under this
 section; or
 (2)  a person who has incurred a loss or disruption of
 the conduct of the person's business, including for-profit or
 not-for-profit activities, as a result of the violation.
 (f)  A person bringing an action under this section may, for
 each violation:
 (1)  seek injunctive relief to restrain a violator from
 continuing the violation;
 (2)  subject to Subsection (g), recover damages in an
 amount equal to the greater of:
 (A) actual damages arising from the violation; or
 (B)  $100,000 for each zombie used to commit the
 violation; or
 (3) obtain both injunctive relief and damages.
 (g)  The court may increase an award of damages, statutory or
 otherwise, in an action brought under this section to an amount not
 to exceed three times the applicable damages if the court finds that
 the violations have occurred with such a frequency as to constitute
 a pattern or practice.
 (h)  A plaintiff who prevails in an action brought under this
 section is entitled to recover court costs and reasonable
 attorney's fees, reasonable fees of experts, and other reasonable
 costs of litigation.
 (i)  A remedy authorized by this section is not exclusive but
 is in addition to any other procedure or remedy provided for by
 other statutory or common law.
 (j)  Nothing in this section may be construed to impose
 liability on the following persons with respect to a violation of
 this section committed by another person:
 (1) an Internet service provider;
 (2)  a provider of interactive computer service, as
 defined by Section 230, Communications Act of 1934 (47 U.S.C.
 Section 230);
 (3)  a telecommunications provider, as defined by
 Section 51.002, Utilities Code; or
 (4)  a video service provider or cable service
 provider, as defined by Section 66.002, Utilities Code.
 SECTION 5. Subsection (a), Section 324.101, Business &
 Commerce Code, as effective April 1, 2009, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (a) Any of the following persons, if adversely affected by
 the violation, may bring a civil action against a person who
 violates Section 324.051, 324.052, 324.053, or 324.054 [this
 chapter]:
 (1) a provider of computer software;
 (2) an owner of a web page or trademark;
 (3) a telecommunications carrier;
 (4) a cable operator; or
 (5) an Internet service provider.
 SECTION 6. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 conduct that occurs on or after the effective date of this Act.
 Conduct that occurs before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect at the time the conduct occurred, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 28 passed the Senate on
 April 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 28, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 28 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor