Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB282 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 282


 AN ACT
 relating to grant and outreach programs to provide nutrition
 education to children.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 adding Section 12.0027 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.0027.  NUTRITION OUTREACH PROGRAM. (a)  The
 department may develop an outreach program to promote better health
 and nutrition programs and prevent obesity among children in this
 state.
 (b)  The department may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and
 donations from any public or private source for the purposes of this
 section.
 (c)  The department may adopt rules as necessary to
 administer an outreach program established under this section.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 38, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 38.026 to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.026.  GRANT PROGRAM FOR BEST PRACTICES IN NUTRITION
 EDUCATION. (a)  The Department of Agriculture shall develop a
 program under which the department awards grants to public school
 campuses for best practices in nutrition education.
 (b)  The Department of Agriculture may solicit and accept
 gifts, grants, and donations from any public or private source for
 the purposes of this section.
 (c)  The Department of Agriculture may adopt rules as
 necessary to administer a grant program established under this
 section.
 SECTION 3. Chapter 33, Human Resources Code, is amended by
 adding Section 33.028 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.028.  GRANT PROGRAMS FOR NUTRITION EDUCATION.
 (a)  The Department of Agriculture shall develop a program under
 which the department awards grants to:
 (1)  participants in the Child and Adult Care Food
 Program, Head Start program, or other early childhood education
 programs to operate nutrition education programs for children who
 are at least three years of age but younger than five years of age;
 and
 (2)  community and faith-based initiatives that
 provide recreational, social, volunteer, leadership, mentoring, or
 developmental programs to incorporate nutrition education into
 programs provided for children younger than 19 years of age.
 (b)  The Department of Agriculture may solicit and accept
 gifts, grants, and donations from any public or private source for
 the purposes of this section.
 (c)  The Department of Agriculture may adopt rules as
 necessary to administer the grant programs established under this
 section.
 SECTION 4. (a) This Act does not make an appropriation. A
 provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program,
 creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental
 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
 provision.
 (b) It is the intent of the legislature that not more than $4
 million may be appropriated for the implementation of this Act for
 the state fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2009.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 282 passed the Senate on
 April 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 282 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor