Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB283 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson, Lucio S.B. No. 283
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2008; February 11, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 March 31, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 31, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 283 By: Davis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the membership and activities of local school health
 advisory councils.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 28.004, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections (d-1), (m), (m-1),
 and (m-2) to read as follows:
 (d) The board of trustees shall appoint members to the local
 school health advisory council. A majority of the members must be
 persons who are parents of students enrolled in the district and who
 are not employed by the district. One of those members shall
 serve as chair or co-chair of the council. The board of trustees
 also may appoint one or more persons from each of the following
 groups or a representative from a group other than a group specified
 under this subsection:
 (1) public school teachers;
 (2) public school administrators;
 (3) district students;
 (4) health care professionals;
 (5) the business community;
 (6) law enforcement;
 (7) senior citizens;
 (8) the clergy; and
 (9) nonprofit health organizations.
 (d-1)  The local school health advisory council shall meet at
 least four times each year.
 (m)  In addition to performing other duties, the local school
 health advisory council shall submit to the board of trustees, at
 least annually, a written report that includes:
 (1)  any council recommendation concerning the school
 district's health education curriculum and instruction or related
 matters that the council has not previously submitted to the board;
 (2)  any suggested modification to a council
 recommendation previously submitted to the board; and
 (3)  a detailed explanation of the council's activities
 during the period between the date of the current report and the
 date of the last prior written report.
 (m-1)  In lieu of the report that otherwise would be required
 under Subsection (m), not later than April 1, 2010, the local school
 health advisory council shall submit to the board of trustees an
 initial written report that includes:
 (1)  any information required under Subsections (m)(1)
 and (2); and
 (2)  a detailed explanation of the council's activities
 during the 12-month period preceding the date of the report.
 (m-2)  Subsection (m-1) and this subsection expire April 30,
 2010.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *