By: Nelson S.B. No. 284 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2008; February 11, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; March 9, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 9, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 284 By: Shapleigh A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to human body and anatomical specimen donation. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 691, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Section 691.0225 to read as follows: Sec. 691.0225. INFORMED CONSENT DOCUMENT. The board shall develop an informed consent document to inform a person making a gift of a decedent's body or anatomical specimen for purposes of education or research of the risks and benefits associated with donation. The board shall make the document available on the board's Internet website. SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 691.031, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) The board shall adopt rules to ensure that: (1) each body or anatomical specimen received or distributed by the board is properly transported; (2) a label with the statement "CONTENTS DERIVED FROM DONATED HUMAN TISSUE" is affixed to the container in which the body or anatomical specimen is transported; and (3) each person who has control or possession of a body or anatomical specimen: (A) satisfactorily completes the information required on a chain-of-custody form prescribed by the board; (B) maintains a copy of the form for the person's records; and (C) transfers the form to any other person to whom control or possession of the body or anatomical specimen is transferred. SECTION 3. Section 692.005, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows: (d) A qualified tissue procurement organization may not act as a donee for a gift of a body or body part under this section unless the organization has provided the Health and Human Services Commission a copy of the organization's accreditation by the American Association of Tissue Banks, the Eye Bank Association of America, or another accreditation organization approved by the commission. (e) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission may adopt rules as necessary to administer this section. SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2010, the Anatomical Board of the State of Texas shall: (1) adopt the rules and form required under Subsection (a), Section 691.031, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act; and (2) develop the informed consent document required under Section 691.0225, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 692.005, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, a qualified tissue procurement organization is not required to be accredited under Subsection (d), Section 692.005, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, on the effective date of this Act, but must comply with this section. (b) A qualified tissue procurement organization that is accredited on the effective date of this Act shall submit proof of accreditation to the Health and Human Services Commission as required under Subsection (d), Section 692.005, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, not later than March 1, 2010. (c) A qualified tissue procurement organization that is not accredited on the effective date of this Act shall: (1) submit proof to the Health and Human Services Commission that the organization has applied for accreditation not later than March 1, 2010; and (2) submit proof to the Health and Human Services Commission that the organization is accredited as required by Subsection (d), Section 692.005, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, not later than March 1, 2011. SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *