Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB284 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 284


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to human body and anatomical specimen donation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 691, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 691.0225 to read as follows:
 Sec. 691.0225.  INFORMED CONSENT DOCUMENT. The board shall
 develop an informed consent document to inform a person making a
 gift of a decedent's body or anatomical specimen for purposes of
 education or research of the risks and benefits associated with
 donation. The board shall make the document available on the
 board's Internet website.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 691.031, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) The board shall adopt rules to ensure that:
 (1) each body or anatomical specimen received or
 distributed by the board is properly transported;
 (2)  a label with the statement "CONTENTS DERIVED FROM
 DONATED HUMAN TISSUE" is affixed to the container in which the body
 or anatomical specimen is transported; and
 (3)  each person who has control or possession of a body
 or anatomical specimen:
 (A)  satisfactorily completes the information
 required on a chain-of-custody form prescribed by the board;
 (B)  maintains a copy of the form for the person's
 records; and
 (C)  transfers the form to any other person to
 whom control or possession of the body or anatomical specimen is
 transferred.
 SECTION 3. Section 692.005, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  A qualified tissue procurement organization may not act
 as a donee for a gift of a body or body part under this section
 unless the organization has provided the Health and Human Services
 Commission a copy of the organization's accreditation by the
 American Association of Tissue Banks, the Eye Bank Association of
 America, or another accreditation organization approved by the
 commission.
 (e)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission may adopt rules as necessary to administer this
 section.
 SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2010, the Anatomical
 Board of the State of Texas shall:
 (1) adopt the rules and form required under Subsection
 (a), Section 691.031, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this
 Act; and
 (2) develop the informed consent document required
 under Section 691.0225, Health and Safety Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 692.005, Health
 and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, a qualified tissue
 procurement organization is not required to be accredited under
 Subsection (d), Section 692.005, Health and Safety Code, as added
 by this Act, on the effective date of this Act, but must comply with
 this section.
 (b) A qualified tissue procurement organization that is
 accredited on the effective date of this Act shall submit proof of
 accreditation to the Health and Human Services Commission as
 required under Subsection (d), Section 692.005, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act, not later than March 1, 2010.
 (c) A qualified tissue procurement organization that is not
 accredited on the effective date of this Act shall:
 (1) submit proof to the Health and Human Services
 Commission that the organization has applied for accreditation not
 later than March 1, 2010; and
 (2) submit proof to the Health and Human Services
 Commission that the organization is accredited as required by
 Subsection (d), Section 692.005, Health and Safety Code, as added
 by this Act, not later than March 1, 2011.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.