Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB287 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R2339 UM-D
 By: Nelson S.B. No. 287


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of electronic prescribing data transmission
 systems under the state Medicaid program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 531.02411, Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.02411. STREAMLINING ADMINISTRATIVE PROCESSES.
 (a) The commission shall make every effort using the
 commission's existing resources to reduce the paperwork and other
 administrative burdens placed on Medicaid recipients and providers
 and other participants in the Medicaid program and shall use
 technology and efficient business practices to decrease those
 burdens. In addition, the commission shall make every effort to
 improve the business practices associated with the administration
 of the Medicaid program by any method the commission determines is
 cost-effective, including:
 (1) expanding the utilization of the electronic claims
 payment system;
 (2) developing an Internet portal system for prior
 authorization requests;
 (3) encouraging Medicaid providers to submit their
 program participation applications electronically;
 (4) ensuring that the Medicaid provider application is
 easy to locate on the Internet so that providers may conveniently
 apply to the program;
 (5) working with federal partners to take advantage of
 every opportunity to maximize additional federal funding for
 technology in the Medicaid program; and
 (6) encouraging the increased use of medical
 technology by providers, including increasing their use of:
 (A) electronic communications between patients
 and their physicians or other health care providers;
 (B) electronic prescribing tools that provide
 up-to-date payer formulary information at the time a physician or
 other health care practitioner writes a prescription and that
 support the electronic transmission of a prescription;
 (C) ambulatory computerized order entry systems
 that facilitate physician and other health care practitioner orders
 at the point of care for medications and laboratory and
 radiological tests;
 (D) inpatient computerized order entry systems
 to reduce errors, improve health care quality, and lower costs in a
 hospital setting;
 (E) regional data-sharing to coordinate patient
 care across a community for patients who are treated by multiple
 providers; and
 (F) electronic intensive care unit technology to
 allow physicians to fully monitor hospital patients remotely.
 (b)  The commission shall develop and implement a plan
 designed to encourage the increased use by Medicaid providers of
 the medical technology described by Subsection (a)(6)(B). The plan
 must include a goal of achieving by September 1, 2014, a specified
 percentage increase in the use of electronic prescribing by
 Medicaid providers. Not later than January 1, 2010, the commission
 shall submit a report to the legislature describing the plan
 developed by the commission in accordance with this subsection.
 Not later than January 1, 2011, and January 1, 2013, the commission
 shall submit a report to the legislature regarding the
 implementation and results of the plan. This subsection expires
 September 1, 2014.
 SECTION 2. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.