Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB287 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            February 22, 2009      TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB287 by Nelson (Relating to the use of electronic prescribing data transmission systems under the state Medicaid program.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill requires the Health and Human Services Commission to develop and implement a plan to increase the use of electronic medical records, medical technology, and electronic prescribing tools by Medicaid providers.  The Health and Human Services Commission must maximize the use of available federal resources to implement the plan. The bill requires that a Medicaid prescriber achieve certain percentage increase in the use of electronic prescribing by September 1, 2014. The plan must be submitted to the legislature by January 1, 2010 with progress reports submitted by January 1, 2011 and January 1, 2013. The bill requires the agency to seek a federal waiver or authorization, if needed, and allows delay in implementation pending federal approval. This bill takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house, or September 1, 2009 if a two-thirds vote is not achieved. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:529 Health and Human Services Commission   LBB Staff:  JOB, CL, MH, GD    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
February 22, 2009





  TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB287 by Nelson (Relating to the use of electronic prescribing data transmission systems under the state Medicaid program.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB287 by Nelson (Relating to the use of electronic prescribing data transmission systems under the state Medicaid program.), As Introduced

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB287 by Nelson (Relating to the use of electronic prescribing data transmission systems under the state Medicaid program.), As Introduced

SB287 by Nelson (Relating to the use of electronic prescribing data transmission systems under the state Medicaid program.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill requires the Health and Human Services Commission to develop and implement a plan to increase the use of electronic medical records, medical technology, and electronic prescribing tools by Medicaid providers.  The Health and Human Services Commission must maximize the use of available federal resources to implement the plan. The bill requires that a Medicaid prescriber achieve certain percentage increase in the use of electronic prescribing by September 1, 2014. The plan must be submitted to the legislature by January 1, 2010 with progress reports submitted by January 1, 2011 and January 1, 2013. The bill requires the agency to seek a federal waiver or authorization, if needed, and allows delay in implementation pending federal approval. This bill takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house, or September 1, 2009 if a two-thirds vote is not achieved.

The bill requires the Health and Human Services Commission to develop and implement a plan to increase the use of electronic medical records, medical technology, and electronic prescribing tools by Medicaid providers.  The Health and Human Services Commission must maximize the use of available federal resources to implement the plan. The bill requires that a Medicaid prescriber achieve certain percentage increase in the use of electronic prescribing by September 1, 2014. The plan must be submitted to the legislature by January 1, 2010 with progress reports submitted by January 1, 2011 and January 1, 2013.

The bill requires the agency to seek a federal waiver or authorization, if needed, and allows delay in implementation pending federal approval.

This bill takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house, or September 1, 2009 if a two-thirds vote is not achieved.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission

529 Health and Human Services Commission

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, MH, GD

 JOB, CL, MH, GD