Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB288 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 288
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2008; February 11, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 2, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 March 2, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 288 By: Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the review of a Medicaid recipient's electronic
 medication history by a provider of Medicaid acute care services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0961 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0961.  MEDICAID PROVIDER REVIEW OF ELECTRONIC
 MEDICATION HISTORY. (a)  A physician or other health care provider
 providing acute care services under the state Medicaid program,
 before providing an acute care service or procedure to a Medicaid
 recipient, shall review the recipient's prescription and
 nonprescription medication history included in:
 (1)  a health passport provided to the recipient under
 Section 266.006, Family Code, or any other law; or
 (2)  any other electronic health records maintained
 under the program with respect to the recipient and to which the
 provider has access.
 (b)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules to ensure
 that each physician or other health care provider providing acute
 care services under the state Medicaid program complies with this
 section.
 SECTION 2. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *