Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB294 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 294
 (In the Senate - Filed November 13, 2008; February 11, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and
 Homeland Security; April 8, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6,
 Nays 2; April 8, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 294 By: Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to optional fees on the registration of a vehicle imposed
 by a county.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 502.172, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) The commissioners court of a county by order may impose
 an additional fee, not to exceed $15 [$10], for registering a
 vehicle in the county.
 SECTION 2. Section 502.1725, Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.1725. OPTIONAL COUNTY FEE FOR TRANSPORTATION
 PROJECTS. (a) [This section applies only to a county:
 [(1) that borders the United Mexican States;
 [(2) that has a population of more than 300,000; and
 [(3)     in which the largest municipality has a
 population of less than 300,000.
 [(b)] The commissioners court of a county by order may
 impose an additional fee, not to exceed $50 [$10], for registering a
 vehicle in the county.
 (b) [(c)] A vehicle that may be registered under this
 chapter without payment of a registration fee may be registered in a
 county imposing a fee under this section without payment of the
 additional fee.
 (c) [(d)] A fee imposed under this section may take effect
 only on January 1 of a year. The county must adopt the order and
 notify the department not later than September 1 of the year
 preceding the year in which the fee takes effect. A fee imposed
 under this section is not required to be annually reauthorized and
 remains in effect until removed as provided by Subsection (d).
 (d) Subject to Subsection (d-1), a [(e) A] fee imposed
 under this section may be removed. The removal may take effect only
 on January 1 of a year. A county may remove the fee only by:
 (1) rescinding the order imposing the fee; and
 (2) notifying the department not later than September
 1 of the year preceding the year in which the removal takes effect.
 (d-1)  If the revenue from a fee imposed under this section
 has been pledged or assigned to secure the payment of bonds or other
 obligations as provided by Subsection (e-1), the fee may not be
 removed until the bonds or other obligations secured by the pledge
 or assignment have been paid or discharged.
 (e) [(f)] The county assessor-collector of a county
 imposing a fee under this section shall collect the additional fee
 for a vehicle when other fees imposed under this chapter are
 collected. The county shall deposit [send] the fee revenue in a
 special account in the county general fund.  Except as provided by
 Subsection (j), money in the account may be used only to contract
 with:
 (1) [to] the regional mobility authority of the county
 to promote and maintain a public purpose of the county that involves
 funding [fund] long-term transportation projects in the county;
 (2)  a transportation governmental entity designated
 under Subsection (i) to promote and maintain a public purpose of the
 county that involves funding long-term transportation projects in
 the county;
 (3)  a rural or urban transit district established
 under Chapter 458 to promote and maintain a public purpose of the
 county; or
 (4)  a public or private entity developing a long-term
 transportation project in the county under an agreement with the
 county, the regional mobility authority of the county, or a
 transportation governmental entity designated under Subsection (i)
 to promote and maintain a public purpose of the county.
 (e-1)  Revenue from a fee imposed under this section may be
 pledged or assigned by the county, the regional mobility authority
 of the county with which the county contracts under Subsection (e),
 or a transportation governmental entity with which the county
 contracts under Subsection (e) to secure the payment of bonds or
 other obligations associated with the development of long-term
 transportation projects in the county as provided by Subsection
 (e).
 (f) [(g)] The department shall collect the additional fee
 on a vehicle that is owned by a resident of a county imposing a fee
 under this section and that, under this chapter, must be registered
 directly with the department. The department shall send all fees
 collected for a county under this subsection to the county for
 deposit and use as provided by Subsection (e) or (e-1) [regional
 mobility authority of the county to fund long-term transportation
 projects in the county].
 (g) [(h)] The department shall adopt rules and develop
 forms necessary to administer registration by mail for a vehicle
 being registered in a county imposing a fee under this section.
 (h)  The total amount of fees imposed by the commissioners
 court of a county under this section and under Section 502.172 may
 not exceed $65.
 (i)  The department shall designate the governmental
 entities that serve primarily a transportation function and with
 which counties may contract under Subsection (e).
 (j)  A county imposing a fee under this section may send a
 portion of the fee revenue to the municipalities in the county in
 proportion to the population of each municipality to support public
 transportation in the municipality provided by a rural or urban
 transit district established under Chapter 458.
 (k)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the fee imposed by the
 commissioners court of a county with a population of at least
 600,000 and that is located on the international border may not
 exceed $10.
 SECTION 3. (a) Except as otherwise provided by this
 section, this Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of
 two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by
 Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not
 receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes
 effect September 1, 2009.
 (b) A vehicle registration fee authorized by Section
 502.1725, Transportation Code, as amended by this Act, may be used
 as provided by Subdivision (3), Subsection (e), Section 502.1725,
 and Subsection (j), Section 502.1725, Transportation Code, as added
 by this Act, only if the constitutional amendment proposed by the
 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, allowing the expenditure
 of vehicle registration fees to construct, maintain, and operate
 passenger rail, transit, and freight rail is approved by the
 voters. If that amendment is not approved by the voters, a vehicle
 registration fee authorized by Section 502.1725, Transportation
 Code, as amended by this Act, may not be used as provided by
 Subdivision (3), Subsection (e), Section 502.1725, and Subsection
 (j), Section 502.1725, Transportation Code.
 * * * * *