Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB329 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 329
 (In the Senate - Filed December 1, 2008; February 11, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and
 Homeland Security; April 8, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 8, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 329 By: Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the automatic suspension of the driver's license of a
 person convicted of certain organized crime offenses; providing
 penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 521.343, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) Except as provided by Sections 521.342(b), 521.344(a),
 (b), (d), (e), (f), (g), (h), and (i), 521.345, 521.346, 521.3465,
 [and] 521.351, and 521.352, a suspension under this subchapter is
 for one year.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter O, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.352 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.352.  SUSPENSION OR PROHIBITION FOR CERTAIN
 ORGANIZED CRIME OFFENSES.  (a)  A person's license is automatically
 suspended on conviction of the person for an offense under Chapter
 71, Penal Code.
 (b)  The department may not issue a driver's license to a
 person convicted of an offense specified in Subsection (a) who, on
 the date of the conviction, did not hold a license.
 (c)  The period of license suspension or prohibition under
 this section begins on a date set by the court that is not earlier
 than the date of conviction or later than the 30th day after the
 date of conviction. The period of license suspension or
 prohibition under this section expires on the first anniversary of
 the date the suspension or prohibition began.
 SECTION 3. Section 521.457, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (f-2) to read as
 follows:
 (e) Except as provided by Subsections (f), [and] (f-1), and
 (f-2), an offense under this section is a Class C misdemeanor.
 (f-2)  If it is shown on the trial of an offense under this
 section that the person operated a motor vehicle on a highway during
 a period that the person's driver's license was suspended under
 Section 521.352 or the person was prohibited from obtaining a
 driver's license under that section, the offense is a Class A
 misdemeanor.
 SECTION 4. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies
 only to an offense committed on or after September 1, 2009.
 (b) An offense committed before September 1, 2009, is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this subsection, an offense was committed before September 1, 2009,
 if any element of the offense was committed before that date.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *