Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB345 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 345
 (In the Senate - Filed December 8, 2008; February 11, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 17, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 March 17, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 345 By: Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to screening health care personnel of home and community
 support services agencies for tuberculosis.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Section 142.012, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) Department rules must [The board by rule shall] set
 minimum standards for home and community support services agencies
 licensed under this chapter that relate to:
 (1) qualifications for professional and
 nonprofessional personnel, including volunteers;
 (2) supervision of professional and nonprofessional
 personnel, including volunteers;
 (3) the implementation, for professional and
 nonprofessional personnel, including volunteers, who have direct
 contact with the agency's clients, of a tuberculosis surveillance
 program, based on the most current guidelines for preventing the
 transmission of Mycobacterium tuberculosis in health care
 facilities published by the Centers for Disease Control and
 Prevention of the United States Public Health Service;
 (4) the provision and coordination of treatment and
 services, including support and bereavement services, as
 appropriate;
 (5) [(4)] the management, ownership, and
 organizational structure, including lines of authority and
 delegation of responsibility and, as appropriate, the composition
 of an interdisciplinary team;
 (6) [(5)] clinical and business records;
 (7) [(6)] financial ability to carry out the functions
 as proposed;
 (8) [(7)] safety, fire prevention, and sanitary
 standards for residential units and inpatient units; and
 (9) [(8)] any other aspects of home health, hospice,
 or personal assistance services as necessary to protect the public.
 SECTION 2. The executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall adopt rules required by Subsection
 (b), Section 142.012, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this
 Act, not later than January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *