Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB348 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 348
 (In the Senate - Filed December 9, 2008; February 11, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and
 Homeland Security; March 2, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 2, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas Transportation Commission's authority to
 establish advisory committees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 201.117 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.117.  ADVISORY COMMITTEES.  (a)  The commission may
 establish, as it considers necessary, advisory committees on any of
 the matters under its jurisdiction.
 (b)  The commission shall determine the purpose, duties, and
 membership of each advisory committee.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *