By: Patrick, Nichols S.B. No. 361 (In the Senate - Filed December 15, 2008; February 17, 2009, read first time and referred to Subcommittee on Flooding and Evacuations; March 30, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute from Committee on Intergovernmental Relations by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; March 30, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 361 By: Patrick A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the requirement that certain water service providers ensure emergency operations during an extended power outage. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 13, Water Code, is amended by adding Sections 13.1395 and 13.1396 to read as follows: Sec. 13.1395. STANDARDS OF EMERGENCY OPERATIONS. (a) In this section: (1) "Affected utility" means a retail public utility, exempt utility, or provider or conveyor of potable or raw water service that furnishes water service to more than one customer in a county with a population of 3.3 million or more. (2) "Emergency operations" means the operation of a water system during an extended power outage at a minimum water pressure of 35 pounds per square inch. (3) "Extended power outage" means a power outage lasting for more than 24 hours. (b) An affected utility shall: (1) ensure the emergency operation of its water system during an extended power outage as soon as safe and practicable following the occurrence of a natural disaster; and (2) adopt and submit to the commission for its approval an emergency preparedness plan that demonstrates the utility's ability to provide emergency operations. (c) The commission shall review and approve or disapprove an emergency preparedness plan submitted under Subsection (b) and issue a notification of approval or a notification of the reasons for disapproval of the plan. In accordance with commission rules, an emergency preparedness plan shall provide for: (1) the maintenance of automatically starting auxiliary generators; (2) the sharing of auxiliary generator capacity with one or more affected utilities; (3) the negotiation of leasing and contracting agreements, including emergency mutual aid agreements with other retail public utilities, exempt utilities, or providers or conveyors of potable or raw water service, if the agreements provide for coordination with the division of emergency management in the governor's office; (4) the use of portable generators capable of serving multiple facilities equipped with quick-connect systems; (5) the use of on-site electrical generation or distributed generation facilities; (6) hardening the electric transmission and distribution system serving the water system; or (7) for existing facilities, the maintenance of direct engine or right angle drives. (d) Not later than June 1, 2011, each affected utility that supplies, provides, or conveys surface water shall include in its emergency preparedness plan under Subsection (b) provisions for the actual installation and maintenance of automatically starting auxiliary generators or distributive generation facilities for each raw water intake pump station, water treatment plant, pump station, and pressure facility necessary to provide water to its wholesale customers. (e) Each affected utility required to submit an emergency preparedness plan under this section shall submit its plan to the commission not later than June 1, 2011. (f) Not later than March 1, 2010, the commission shall adopt rules to implement this section as an alternative to any rule requiring elevated storage. (g) The commission shall provide an affected utility with access to the commission's financial, managerial, and technical contractors to assist the utility in complying with the applicable emergency preparedness plan submission deadline. (h) The commission by rule shall create an emergency preparedness plan template for use by an affected utility when submitting a plan under this section. The emergency preparedness plan template shall contain: (1) a list and explanation of the preparations an affected utility may make under Subsection (c) for the commission to approve the utility's emergency preparedness plan; and (2) a list of all commission rules and standards pertaining to emergency preparedness plans. (i) An emergency generator used as part of an approved emergency preparedness plan under Subsection (c) must be operated and maintained according to the manufacturer's specifications. (j) An affected utility shall implement its emergency preparedness plan as approved by the commission not later than June 1, 2011. The commission shall inspect each utility to ensure that the utility complies with the approved plan. (k) The commission may not grant a waiver of the requirements of this section to any affected utility. (l) An affected utility may adopt and enforce limitations on water use while the utility is providing emergency operations. (m) Except as specifically required by this section, information provided by an affected utility under this section is confidential and is not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code. Sec. 13.1396. COORDINATION OF EMERGENCY OPERATIONS. (a) In this section: (1) "Affected utility" has the meaning assigned by Section 13.1395. (2) "County judge" means a county judge or the person designated by a county judge. (3) "Electric utility" means the electric transmission and distribution utility providing electric service to the water and wastewater facilities of an affected utility. (b) An affected utility shall submit to the county judge, the office of emergency management of each county in which the utility has more than one customer, the Public Utility Commission of Texas, and the office of emergency management of the governor, a copy of: (1) the affected utility's emergency preparedness plan approved under Section 13.1395; and (2) the commission's notification to the affected utility that the plan is approved. (c) Not later than December 31, 2009, the affected utility shall submit to the county judge and the office of emergency management of each county in which the utility has water and wastewater facilities that qualify for critical load status under rules adopted by the Public Utility Commission of Texas, and to the Public Utility Commission of Texas and the division of emergency management of the governor: (1) information identifying the location and providing a general description of all water and wastewater facilities that qualify for critical load status; and (2) emergency contact information for the affected utility, including: (A) the person who will serve as a point of contact and the person's telephone number; (B) the person who will serve as an alternative point of contact and the person's telephone number; and (C) the affected utility's mailing address. (d) An affected utility shall immediately update the information provided under Subsection (c) as changes to the information occur. (e) Not later than March 1 of each year, the county judge of each county that receives the information required by Subsections (c) and (d) shall: (1) submit the information for each affected utility to relevant electric utilities; and (2) in cooperation with the affected utility, submit for each affected utility any forms reasonably required by an electric utility for determining critical load status, including a critical care eligibility determination form or similar form. (f) Not later than June 1 of each year, an electric utility that has received information relating to an affected utility under Subsection (e) shall determine whether the facilities of the affected utility qualify for critical load status under rules adopted by the Public Utility Commission of Texas. (g) If an electric utility determines that an affected utility's facilities do not qualify for critical load status, the electric utility, not later than the 30th day after the date the electric utility receives the information required by Subsections (c) and (d), shall provide a detailed explanation of the electric utility's determination to each county judge that submitted the information. (h) Except as specifically required by this section, information received under this section is confidential and is not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code. SECTION 2. Not later than March 1, 2010, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall adopt standards as required by Section 13.1395, Water Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *