Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB367 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 367
 (In the Senate - Filed December 15, 2008; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and
 Homeland Security; April 8, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 367 By: Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution of and punishment for certain criminal
 offenses involving the use of a false or fictitious identity or
 identifying documents.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 37.10, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (j) to read as follows:
 (j)  It is not a defense to prosecution under Subsection
 (a)(2) that the record, document, or thing made, presented, or used
 displays or contains the statement "NOT A GOVERNMENT DOCUMENT" or
 another substantially similar statement intended to alert a person
 to the falsity of the record, document, or thing, unless the record,
 document, or thing displays the statement diagonally printed
 clearly and indelibly on both the front and back of the record,
 document, or thing in solid red capital letters at least one-fourth
 inch in height.
 SECTION 2. Section 521.454, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  If conduct constituting an offense under this section
 also constitutes an offense under another law, the actor may be
 prosecuted under this section, the other law, or both.
 SECTION 3. Section 521.455, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  If conduct constituting an offense under this section
 also constitutes an offense under another law, the actor may be
 prosecuted under this section, the other law, or both.
 SECTION 4. Section 521.456, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  If conduct constituting an offense under this section
 also constitutes an offense under another law, the actor may be
 prosecuted under this section, the other law, or both.
 SECTION 5. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *