Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB379 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 379


 AN ACT
 relating to the duties of the Texas Fusion Center, including an
 annual report by the center regarding criminal street gangs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 421.082, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (e), (f), and (g) to read as follows:
 (e)  The gang section of the center shall annually submit to
 the governor and the legislature a report assessing the threat
 posed statewide by criminal street gangs. The report must include
 identification of:
 (1)  law enforcement strategies that have been proven
 effective in deterring gang-related crime; and
 (2) gang involvement in trafficking of persons.
 (f)  On request, the office of the attorney general, the
 Department of Public Safety, the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice, other law enforcement agencies, and juvenile justice
 agencies of this state shall provide to the gang section of the
 center information relating to criminal street gangs, gang-related
 crime, and gang involvement in trafficking of persons.
 (g)  Any information received by the center under this
 section that is stored, combined with other information, analyzed,
 or disseminated is subject to the rules governing criminal
 intelligence in 28 C.F.R. Part 23.
 SECTION 2. The gang section of the Texas Fusion Center shall
 submit the first annual report regarding criminal street gangs to
 the governor and the legislature as required by Subsection (e),
 Section 421.082, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later
 than September 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 379 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0;
 May 30, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 379 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 30, 2009, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor