Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB384 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 384
 (In the Senate - Filed December 19, 2008; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and
 Homeland Security; March 20, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 20, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the promotion of toll projects by the Texas Department
 of Transportation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 228.004, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 228.004. [PROMOTION OF] TOLL PROJECT INFORMATION.
 (a) The department may, notwithstanding Chapter 2113, Government
 Code, engage in marketing, advertising, and other activities to
 provide information relating to the status of pending or ongoing
 [promote the development and use of] toll projects and may enter
 into contracts or agreements necessary to procure marketing,
 advertising, or informational [other promotional] services from
 outside service providers.
 (b)  This section does not authorize the department to engage
 in marketing, advertising, or other activities for the purpose of
 influencing public opinion about the use of toll roads or the use of
 tolls as a financial mechanism.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a contract or agreement entered into or renewed under Section
 228.004, Transportation Code, on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A contract or agreement entered into or renewed under
 that section before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law in effect immediately before that date, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *