Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB388 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 388
 (In the Senate - Filed December 23, 2008; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 15, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 15, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 388 By: Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a law enforcement integrity unit in the
 Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.0207 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.0207.  PUBLIC CORRUPTION UNIT. (a)  In this
 section, "organized criminal activity" means conduct that
 constitutes an offense under Section 71.02, Penal Code.
 (b)  A law enforcement integrity unit is created within the
 department to investigate and assist in the management of
 allegations of participation in organized criminal activity by:
 (1)  an individual elected, appointed, or employed to
 serve as a peace officer for a governmental entity of this state
 under Article 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure; or
 (2)  a federal law enforcement officer while performing
 duties in this state.
 (c) The unit shall:
 (1)  assist district attorneys and county attorneys in
 the investigation and prosecution of allegations described by
 Subsection (b);
 (2)  if requested by the agency, assist a state or local
 law enforcement agency with the investigation of such allegations
 against law enforcement officers in the agency;
 (3)  assist the United States Department of Justice or
 any other appropriate federal department or agency in the
 investigation and prosecution of allegations described by
 Subsection (b);
 (4)  if requested by the agency, assist a federal law
 enforcement agency with the investigation of such allegations
 against law enforcement officers in the agency;
 (5)  serve as a clearinghouse for information relating
 to the investigation and prosecution of allegations described by
 Subsection (b); and
 (6)  report to the highest-ranking officer of the Texas
 Rangers division of the department.
 (d)  On written approval of the director or of the chair of
 the commission, the highest-ranking officer of the Texas Rangers
 division of the department may initiate an investigation of an
 allegation of participation in organized criminal activity by a law
 enforcement officer described by Subsection (b)(1).  Written
 approval under this subsection must be based on cause.
 (e)  To the extent allowed by law, a state or local law
 enforcement agency shall cooperate with the law enforcement
 integrity unit by providing information requested by the unit as
 necessary to carry out the purposes of this section. Information
 described by this subsection is excepted from required disclosure
 under Chapter 552 in the manner provided by Section 552.108.
 SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2010, the Department
 of Public Safety of the State of Texas shall establish the law
 enforcement integrity unit under Section 411.0207, Government
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *