Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB395 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R3279 SJM-D
 By: Lucio S.B. No. 395


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creation of the Early Childhood Health and Nutrition
 Interagency Council.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle E, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 115 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 115. EARLY CHILDHOOD HEALTH AND NUTRITION INTERAGENCY
 COUNCIL
 Sec. 115.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "council" means
 the Early Childhood Health and Nutrition Interagency Council.
 Sec. 115.002.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT.  The Early
 Childhood Health and Nutrition Interagency Council is subject to
 Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued
 in existence as provided by that chapter, the council is abolished
 and this chapter expires September 1, 2019.
 Sec. 115.003.  COMPOSITION OF COUNCIL; PRESIDING OFFICER.
 (a)  The Department of Agriculture shall establish the Early
 Childhood Health and Nutrition Interagency Council. The council is
 composed of six members as follows:
 (1)  a representative of the Health and Human Services
 Commission's Office of Program Coordination for Children and Youth,
 appointed by the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission;
 (2)  a representative of the Department of State Health
 Services' Chronic Disease Prevention Branch, appointed by the
 commissioner of state health services;
 (3)  a representative of the Texas Workforce
 Commission, appointed by the executive director of the Texas
 Workforce Commission;
 (4)  a representative of the Department of Agriculture,
 appointed by the commissioner of agriculture;
 (5)  a representative of the Texas Education Agency's
 Health and Safety Division, appointed by the commissioner of
 education; and
 (6)  a representative of the Department of Family and
 Protective Services' Child Care Licensing Division, appointed by
 the commissioner of the Department of Family and Protective
 Services.
 (b)  The representative appointed under Subsection (a)(4)
 shall serve as the presiding officer of the council.
 Sec. 115.004.  DEPARTMENT DUTIES. The Department of
 Agriculture shall provide staff and resources as necessary for the
 operation of the council.
 Sec. 115.005.  TERMS; VACANCY. (a)  Members of the council
 serve staggered, two-year terms, with the terms of members
 appointed under Sections 115.003(a)(1) through (3) expiring
 February 1 of each odd-numbered year and the terms of members
 appointed under Sections 115.003(a)(4) through (6) expiring
 February 1 of each even-numbered year.
 (b) A member may be reappointed.
 (c)  A vacancy on the council shall be filled for the
 remainder of the unexpired term in the same manner as provided by
 Section 115.003(a).
 Sec. 115.006.  MEETINGS.  (a)  The council shall meet in
 person once each quarter and hold at least four meetings by
 conference call each year. The council may invite stakeholders to
 participate in council meetings.  Section 551.125, Government Code,
 applies to a meeting held by conference call under this section,
 except that Section 551.125(b) does not apply.
 (b)  Not later than August 1, 2010, the council shall provide
 three or more opportunities for public input, including two or more
 public hearings, to receive stakeholder input.  This subsection
 expires September 1, 2010.
 Sec. 115.007.  COUNCIL POWERS AND DUTIES. (a)  The council
 shall conduct research to assess:
 (1)  the health of children under the age of five in
 this state compared to the health of similar children in other
 states;
 (2)  the significance of nutrition and physical
 activity in the development of children under the age of six; and
 (3)  the effectiveness of nutrition and physical
 activity requirements and practices in early childhood care
 settings.
 (b)  The council shall review the status of the programs
 administered by each agency represented on the council that promote
 health and nutrition in early childhood care settings.
 (c)  The council shall consult with key stakeholders to
 identify:
 (1)  barriers to improving nutrition and physical
 activity standards in early childhood care settings; and
 (2)  best practices for improving early childhood
 health through nutrition and physical activity.
 (d)  The council may contract with a university to study and
 report on best practices and obstacles for addressing early
 childhood health through nutrition and physical activity.
 Sec. 115.008.  COMPENSATION; REIMBURSEMENT. (a)  A member
 of the council may not receive compensation for service on the
 council.
 (b)  A member shall be reimbursed for the member's actual and
 necessary expenses for meals, lodging, transportation, and
 incidental expenses incurred while performing council business,
 subject to any applicable limitation on reimbursement prescribed by
 the General Appropriations Act.
 Sec. 115.009.  EARLY CHILDHOOD NUTRITION AND ACTIVITY PLAN.
 (a) The council shall develop an early childhood nutrition and
 activity plan for implementation over a six-year period. The plan
 must address the financing, staffing, and training required to
 implement the plan and must include methods to:
 (1)  increase fruit and vegetable consumption among
 children under the age of six;
 (2)  increase daily structured and unstructured
 physical activity in early childhood care settings;
 (3)  increase awareness among parents of the benefits
 of breast-feeding;
 (4)  facilitate the consumption of breast milk in early
 childhood care settings;
 (5)  decrease malnutrition and undernourishment among
 children under the age of six; and
 (6)  engage existing community and state resources and
 service providers to educate and increase the awareness of parents
 and caretakers regarding the need for proper nutrition.
 (b)  The council, not later than November 1, 2010, shall
 submit a written early childhood nutrition and activity plan to the
 legislature and the governor. This subsection expires December 1,
 2010.
 Sec. 115.010.  GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS. The council
 may accept a gift, grant, or donation from any source to carry out
 the purposes of this chapter.
 Sec. 115.011.  REPORT. The council shall submit to both
 houses of the legislature and the governor on or before November 1
 of each even-numbered year a written report on:
 (1)  the actions taken in furtherance of the six-year
 plan; and
 (2)  the areas that need improvement in implementing
 the plan.
 Sec. 115.012.  RULES.  The commissioner of agriculture may
 adopt rules necessary to implement this chapter.
 SECTION 2. (a) The Early Childhood Health and Nutrition
 Interagency Council shall submit an initial report required under
 Section 115.011, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, not
 later than November 1, 2012.
 (b) As soon as practicable after the effective date of this
 Act, the designated appointing officials shall appoint the members
 to the Early Childhood Health and Nutrition Interagency Council
 established under Chapter 115, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.