Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB398 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 398
 (In the Senate - Filed January 5, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 March 16, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 4; March 16, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 398 By: Williams


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to professional staff salaries paid by school districts
 that establish a local minimum hiring schedule.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter I, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.4021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.4021.  SALARIES IN DISTRICTS ESTABLISHING LOCAL
 MINIMUM HIRING SCHEDULE. (a)  This section applies only to a
 school district that establishes a local minimum hiring schedule
 that prescribes the minimum salary, based on the employee's level
 of experience, that the district will pay a new employee, without
 prescribing a minimum salary applicable to subsequent years of that
 employee's employment with the district.
 (b)  A school district to which this section applies that
 pays each classroom teacher, full-time librarian, full-time
 counselor certified under Subchapter B, or full-time nurse a
 greater amount than the minimum monthly salary to which the
 employee is entitled under Section 21.402 is not required by this
 code to provide annual pay increases based on the employee's level
 of experience.
 (c)  If the minimum salaries prescribed by Section 21.402 are
 increased and the state provides additional funding for the amount
 of that increase, a school district to which this section applies is
 not required to pay an employee more than the sum of the additional
 funding per employee provided by the state and the employee's
 salary for the school year immediately preceding the school year
 for which the additional state funding is provided.
 (d)  To the extent of any conflict between Section 21.402 and
 this section, Section 21.402 prevails.
 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2009-2010
 school year.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *