Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB401 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 401
 (In the Senate - Filed January 5, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 March 9, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 9, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 401 By: Averitt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility for the small and mid-sized district
 adjustment under the public school finance system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 42.2516, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (h-2) to read as
 follows:
 (b) Subject to Subsections (b-1), (b-2), (f-1), (g), [and]
 (h), and (h-2), but notwithstanding any other provision of this
 title, a school district is entitled to state revenue necessary to
 provide the district with the sum of:
 (1) the amount of state revenue necessary to maintain
 state and local revenue per student in weighted average daily
 attendance in the amount equal to the greater of:
 (A) the amount of state and local revenue per
 student in weighted average daily attendance for the maintenance
 and operations of the district available to the district for the
 2005-2006 school year;
 (B) the amount of state and local revenue per
 student in weighted average daily attendance for the maintenance
 and operations of the district to which the district would have been
 entitled for the 2006-2007 school year under this chapter, as it
 existed on January 1, 2006, or, if the district would have been
 subject to Chapter 41, as that chapter existed on January 1, 2006,
 the amount to which the district would have been entitled under that
 chapter, based on the funding elements in effect for the 2005-2006
 school year, if the district imposed a maintenance and operations
 tax at the rate adopted by the district for the 2005 tax year; or
 (C) the amount of state and local revenue per
 student in weighted average daily attendance for the maintenance
 and operations of the district to which the district would have been
 entitled for the 2006-2007 school year under this chapter, as it
 existed on January 1, 2006, or, if the district would have been
 subject to Chapter 41, as that chapter existed on January 1, 2006,
 the amount to which the district would have been entitled under that
 chapter, based on the funding elements in effect for the 2005-2006
 school year, if the district imposed a maintenance and operations
 tax at the rate equal to the rate described by Section 26.08(i) or
 (k)(1), Tax Code, as applicable, for the 2006 tax year;
 (2) an amount equal to the product of $2,500
 multiplied by the number of classroom teachers, full-time
 librarians, full-time counselors certified under Subchapter B,
 Chapter 21, and full-time school nurses employed by the district
 and entitled to a minimum salary under Section 21.402; and
 (3) an amount equal to the product of $275 multiplied
 by the number of students in average daily attendance in grades nine
 through 12 in the district.
 (h-2)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this code, the
 repeal of Section 42.103(e) by S.B. No. 401, Acts of the 81st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, may not increase the amount of
 state and local funds to which a school district is entitled under
 Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2. Subsection (e), Section 42.103, Education Code,
 is repealed.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *