Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB404 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 16, 2009      TO: Honorable John Carona, Chair, Senate Committee on Transportation & Homeland Security      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB404 by Carona (Relating to the authority of certain toll project entities to enter into a comprehensive development agreement.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would extend the expiration date in current law from August 31, 2009, to August 31, 2015 for the statutory authority of the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) and a Regional Mobility Authority (RMA) to enter into a new comprehensive development agreement (CDA). The bill would also extend the expiration date in current law from August 31, 2009, to August 31, 2017 for the authority of TxDOT and an RMA to enter into a CDA (1) that includes one or more managed lane facilities to be added to an existing controlled-access highway; (2) the major portion of which is located in a nonattainment or near-nonattainment air quality area as designated by the United States Environmental Protection Agency; and (3) for which the department has issued a request for qualifications before May 1, 2007 (TxDOT CDA), or before June 11, 2007 (RMA CDA). Based on the analysis of TxDOT, it is assumed the provisions of the bill would not result in a significant fiscal impact to the state. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:601 Department of Transportation   LBB Staff:  JOB, KJG, TG    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 16, 2009





  TO: Honorable John Carona, Chair, Senate Committee on Transportation & Homeland Security      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB404 by Carona (Relating to the authority of certain toll project entities to enter into a comprehensive development agreement.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable John Carona, Chair, Senate Committee on Transportation & Homeland Security
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB404 by Carona (Relating to the authority of certain toll project entities to enter into a comprehensive development agreement.), As Introduced

 Honorable John Carona, Chair, Senate Committee on Transportation & Homeland Security 

 Honorable John Carona, Chair, Senate Committee on Transportation & Homeland Security 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB404 by Carona (Relating to the authority of certain toll project entities to enter into a comprehensive development agreement.), As Introduced

SB404 by Carona (Relating to the authority of certain toll project entities to enter into a comprehensive development agreement.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would extend the expiration date in current law from August 31, 2009, to August 31, 2015 for the statutory authority of the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) and a Regional Mobility Authority (RMA) to enter into a new comprehensive development agreement (CDA). The bill would also extend the expiration date in current law from August 31, 2009, to August 31, 2017 for the authority of TxDOT and an RMA to enter into a CDA (1) that includes one or more managed lane facilities to be added to an existing controlled-access highway; (2) the major portion of which is located in a nonattainment or near-nonattainment air quality area as designated by the United States Environmental Protection Agency; and (3) for which the department has issued a request for qualifications before May 1, 2007 (TxDOT CDA), or before June 11, 2007 (RMA CDA). Based on the analysis of TxDOT, it is assumed the provisions of the bill would not result in a significant fiscal impact to the state.

The bill would extend the expiration date in current law from August 31, 2009, to August 31, 2015 for the statutory authority of the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) and a Regional Mobility Authority (RMA) to enter into a new comprehensive development agreement (CDA). The bill would also extend the expiration date in current law from August 31, 2009, to August 31, 2017 for the authority of TxDOT and an RMA to enter into a CDA (1) that includes one or more managed lane facilities to be added to an existing controlled-access highway; (2) the major portion of which is located in a nonattainment or near-nonattainment air quality area as designated by the United States Environmental Protection Agency; and (3) for which the department has issued a request for qualifications before May 1, 2007 (TxDOT CDA), or before June 11, 2007 (RMA CDA).

Based on the analysis of TxDOT, it is assumed the provisions of the bill would not result in a significant fiscal impact to the state.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 601 Department of Transportation

601 Department of Transportation

LBB Staff: JOB, KJG, TG

 JOB, KJG, TG