Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB404 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS     Senate Research Center S.B. 404 81R1515 SLB-D By: Carona  Transportation & Homeland Security  3/13/2009  As Filed     AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   In 2003, the 78th Legislature passed H.B. 3588, which changed the structure of Texas transportation infrastructure financing by allowing public-private partnerships as a means for developing transportation infrastructure through comprehensive development agreements (CDAs). Chapters 223 (Bids and Contracts for Highway Projects) and 370 (Regional Mobility Authorities), Transportation Code, authorize the use of CDAs; however, the authority provided for under these chapters expires in August 2009. With limited means of funding transportation projects, CDAs are a necessary tool for providing financing for future transportation infrastructure.    As proposed,  S.B. 404 provides that the authority to enter into CDAs, except under certain circumstances, is extended for an additional six years.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Sections 223.201(f) and (i), Transportation Code, as follows:   (f) Provides that the authority to enter into comprehensive development agreements provided by this section, except as provided by Subsections (h) and (i), expires on August 31, 2015, rather than 2009.    (i) Provides that the authority to enter into a comprehensive development agreement for a project exempted from Subsection (f) or Section 223.210(b) (related to a comprehensive development agreement entered into with a private participant by a toll project entity) expires August 31, 2017, rather than 2011.    SECTION 2. Amends Sections 370.305(d) and (f), Transportation Code, as follows:   (d) Provides that the authority to enter into comprehensive development agreements under this section, except as provided by Subsections (e) and (f), expires on August 31, 2015, rather than 2009.    (f) Provides that the authority to enter into a comprehensive development agreement for a project exempted from Subsection (d) or Section 223.210(b) expires August 31, 2017, rather than 2011.    SECTION 3. Effective date: September 1, 2009.  

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 404

81R1515 SLB-D By: Carona

 Transportation & Homeland Security

 3/13/2009

 As Filed

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

In 2003, the 78th Legislature passed H.B. 3588, which changed the structure of Texas transportation infrastructure financing by allowing public-private partnerships as a means for developing transportation infrastructure through comprehensive development agreements (CDAs). Chapters 223 (Bids and Contracts for Highway Projects) and 370 (Regional Mobility Authorities), Transportation Code, authorize the use of CDAs; however, the authority provided for under these chapters expires in August 2009. With limited means of funding transportation projects, CDAs are a necessary tool for providing financing for future transportation infrastructure. 

 

As proposed,  S.B. 404 provides that the authority to enter into CDAs, except under certain circumstances, is extended for an additional six years.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Sections 223.201(f) and (i), Transportation Code, as follows:

 

(f) Provides that the authority to enter into comprehensive development agreements provided by this section, except as provided by Subsections (h) and (i), expires on August 31, 2015, rather than 2009. 

 

(i) Provides that the authority to enter into a comprehensive development agreement for a project exempted from Subsection (f) or Section 223.210(b) (related to a comprehensive development agreement entered into with a private participant by a toll project entity) expires August 31, 2017, rather than 2011. 

 

SECTION 2. Amends Sections 370.305(d) and (f), Transportation Code, as follows:

 

(d) Provides that the authority to enter into comprehensive development agreements under this section, except as provided by Subsections (e) and (f), expires on August 31, 2015, rather than 2009. 

 

(f) Provides that the authority to enter into a comprehensive development agreement for a project exempted from Subsection (d) or Section 223.210(b) expires August 31, 2017, rather than 2011. 

 

SECTION 3. Effective date: September 1, 2009.