Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB407 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapiro S.B. No. 407
 (In the Senate - Filed January 6, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 2, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 2, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 407 By: Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appointment of magistrates to hear truancy cases in
 certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 54.1172, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) The county judge may appoint one or more part-time or
 full-time magistrates to hear a matter alleging a violation of
 Section 25.093 or 25.094, Education Code.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *