Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB419 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 419
 (In the Senate - Filed January 7, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and
 Homeland Security; April 8, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 419 By: Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the evidence required for the release of a motor vehicle
 after impoundment of the vehicle for failure to maintain evidence
 of financial responsibility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (c), Section 601.262, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (c) The evidence of financial responsibility must cover the
 one-year [two-year] period immediately following the date the
 defendant applies for release of the impounded vehicle.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *