Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB43 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 43


 AN ACT
 relating to tuition and fee exemptions at public institutions of
 higher education for students who have been under the
 conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective
 Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The heading to Section 54.211, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.211. EXEMPTIONS FOR STUDENTS UNDER CONSERVATORSHIP
 OF DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND PROTECTIVE SERVICES [IN FOSTER OR OTHER
 RESIDENTIAL CARE].
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 54.211, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a) A student is exempt from the payment of tuition and fees
 authorized in this chapter, including tuition and fees charged by
 an institution of higher education for a dual credit course or other
 course for which a high school student may earn joint high school
 and college credit, if the student:
 (1) was [in foster care or other residential care]
 under the conservatorship of the Department of Family and
 Protective Services [on or after]:
 (A) on the day preceding the student's 18th
 birthday;
 (B) on or after the day of the student's 14th
 birthday, if the student was also eligible for adoption on or after
 that day; [or]
 (C) on the day the student graduated from high
 school or received the equivalent of a high school diploma; or
 (D)  during an academic term in which the student
 was enrolled in a dual credit course or other course for which a
 high school student may earn joint high school and college credit;
 and
 (2) enrolls in an institution of higher education as
 an undergraduate student or in a dual credit course or other course
 for which a high school student may earn joint high school and
 college credit not later than[:
 [(A)     the third anniversary of the date the
 student was discharged from the foster or other residential care,
 the date the student graduated from high school, or the date the
 student received the equivalent of a high school diploma, whichever
 date is earliest; or
 [(B)] the student's 25th [21st] birthday.
 SECTION 3. Section 54.211, Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies beginning with tuition and other fees charged for
 the 2010 spring semester. Tuition and other fees charged for an
 academic period before that semester are covered by the law in
 effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 43 passed the Senate on
 April 2, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 6, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 43 passed the House, with
 amendment, on April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor