Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB442 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 442
 (In the Senate - Filed January 9, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the receipt of death benefits in the workers'
 compensation system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsections (d-2) and (f), Section 408.182,
 Labor Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (d-2) Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, to be
 eligible to receive death benefits under Subsection (d-1), an
 eligible parent must file with the division a claim for those
 benefits not later than the first anniversary of the date of the
 injured employee's death from the compensable injury. The claim
 must designate all eligible parents and necessary information for
 payment to the eligible parents. The insurance carrier is not
 liable for payment to any eligible parent not designated on the
 claim. Failure to file a claim in the time required bars the claim
 unless good cause exists for the failure to file a claim under this
 section [The commissioner may extend the time for filing a claim
 under this subsection only if the eligible parent submits proof
 satisfactory to the commissioner of a compelling reason for the
 delay].
 (f) In this section:
 (1) "Eligible child" means a child of a deceased
 employee if the child is:
 (A) a minor;
 (B) enrolled as a full-time student in an
 accredited educational institution and is less than 25 years of
 age; or
 (C) a dependent of the deceased employee at the
 time of the employee's death.
 (2) "Eligible grandchild" means a grandchild of a
 deceased employee who is a dependent of the deceased employee and
 whose parent is not an eligible child.
 (3) "Eligible spouse" means the surviving spouse of a
 deceased employee unless the spouse abandoned the employee for
 longer than the year immediately preceding the death without good
 cause, as determined by the division.
 (4) "Eligible parent" means the mother or the father
 of a deceased employee, including an adoptive parent or a
 stepparent[, who receives burial benefits under Section 408.186].
 The term does not include a parent whose parental rights have been
 terminated.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a claim for workers' compensation benefits based on a
 compensable injury that occurs on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A claim based on a compensable injury that occurs before
 that date is governed by the law in effect on the date that the
 compensable injury occurred, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *