Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB451 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 451


 AN ACT
 relating to staff development requirements in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 21.451, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections (e), (f), and (g) to
 read as follows:
 (d) The staff development [may]:
 (1) may include training in:
 (A) technology;
 (B) conflict resolution; and
 (C) discipline strategies, including classroom
 management, district discipline policies, and the student code of
 conduct adopted under Section 37.001 and Chapter 37; and
 (2) subject to Subsection (e), must include training
 based on scientifically based research, as defined by Section 9101,
 No Child Left Behind Act of 2001 (20 U.S.C. Section 7801), that:
 (A) relates to instruction of students with
 disabilities; and
 (B) is designed for educators who work primarily
 outside the area of special education.
 (e)  A school district is required to provide the training
 described by Subsection (d)(2) to an educator who works primarily
 outside the area of special education only if the educator does not
 possess the knowledge and skills necessary to implement the
 individualized education program developed for a student receiving
 instruction from the educator.  A district may determine the time
 and place at which the training is delivered.
 (f)  In developing or maintaining the training required by
 Subsection (d)(2), a school district must consult with persons with
 expertise in research-based practices for students with
 disabilities.  Persons who may be consulted under this subsection
 include colleges, universities, private and nonprofit
 organizations, regional education service centers, qualified
 district personnel, and any other persons identified as qualified
 by the district.  This subsection applies to all training required
 by Subsection (d)(2), regardless of whether the training is
 provided at the campus or district level.
 (g) The staff development may[; and
 [(3)] include instruction as to what is permissible
 under law, including opinions of the United States Supreme Court,
 regarding prayer in public school.
 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2009-2010
 school year.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 451 passed the Senate on
 March 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 451 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor