Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB461 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gallegos S.B. No. 461
 (In the Senate - Filed January 12, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 9, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 9, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility to take the entrance examination for a
 beginning position in the fire department.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 143.023, Local
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) A person may not take an entrance examination for a
 beginning position in the [fire or] police department unless the
 person is at least 18 years of age. A person may not take an
 entrance examination for a beginning position in the fire
 department unless the person is at least 18 years of age but not 36
 years of age or older.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act to Subsection
 (a), Section 143.023, Local Government Code, applies only to an
 entrance examination given on or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *