Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB474 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Estes S.B. No. 474
 (In the Senate - Filed January 13, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 29, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 29, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 474 By: Averitt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the comptroller of public accounts' use of electronic
 paycards to make certain payments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 403.016, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (k) to read as follows:
 (k)  Notwithstanding another provision of this section, the
 comptroller may make a payment in any amount to a state employee
 under Subsection (b) or to an annuitant under Subsection (c)(1) or
 other law on an electronic paycard if the employee or annuitant
 agrees to accept payment by that method.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 403, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 403.0161 to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.0161.  CONTRACTS FOR ELECTRONIC PAYCARD SERVICES.
 The comptroller shall contract with one or more vendors for the
 provision of electronic paycard services.  A contract under this
 section must be by competitive bid.  The comptroller shall specify
 the qualifications for bidders, which must include requirements
 that the entity that issues the paycard must:
 (1)  be federally insured or possess sufficient
 financial resources to ensure protection of payees; and
 (2)  demonstrate adequate 24-hour customer service to
 ensure that all payees are able to reasonably access their funds
 worldwide at any time.
 SECTION 3. Section 659.084, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 659.084. ELECTRONIC FUNDS TRANSFER. Salaries for
 state officers and employees paid once a month shall be paid through
 electronic funds transfer under Section 403.016 unless paid on an
 electronic paycard or warrant as permitted under that section.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010.
 * * * * *