Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB490 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 490
 (In the Senate - Filed January 15, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 30, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 30, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to money paid into the registry of a court in certain
 counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 117.111, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 117.111. SUBCHAPTER APPLICABLE TO COUNTY WITH
 POPULATION OF 2.2 [2.4] MILLION OR MORE. This subchapter applies
 only to a county with a population of 2.2 [2.4] million or more.
 SECTION 2. The heading to Subchapter E, Chapter 117, Local
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E. SPECIAL PROVISIONS APPLYING TO FUNDS PAID
 INTO COURT REGISTRY IN COUNTY WITH POPULATION OF
 MORE THAN 2.2 [2.4] MILLION
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *