Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB507 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eltife S.B. No. 507
 (In the Senate - Filed January 21, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 19, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; March 19, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to filing a wage claim.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsections (b) and (d), Section 61.051, Labor
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b) A wage claim must be filed in a manner and [in writing]
 on a form prescribed by the commission and must be verified by the
 employee.
 (d) The employee may file the wage claim:
 (1) in person at an office of the commission; [or]
 (2) by mailing the claim to an address designated by
 the commission;
 (3)  by faxing the claim to a fax number designated by
 the commission; or
 (4)  by any other means adopted by the commission by
 rule.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a wage claim that is filed with the Texas Workforce Commission on
 or after the effective date of this Act. A wage claim filed before
 that date is governed by the law in effect on the date that the claim
 was filed, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *