Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB517 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Harris S.B. No. 517
 (In the Senate - Filed January 23, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 9, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 9, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the application of the child support guidelines in a
 suit affecting the parent-child relationship.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a-1), Section 154.125, Family Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a-1) The dollar amount prescribed by Subsection (a) is
 adjusted every six years as necessary to reflect inflation. The
 Title IV-D agency shall compute the adjusted amount, to take effect
 beginning September 1 of the year of the adjustment, based on the
 percentage change in the consumer price index during the 72-month
 [preceding six-year] period preceding March 1 of the year of the
 adjustment [in the consumer price index], as rounded to the nearest
 $50 increment. The Title IV-D agency shall publish the adjusted
 amount in the Texas Register before September 1 of the year in which
 the adjustment takes effect. For purposes of this subsection,
 "consumer price index" has the meaning assigned by Section 341.201,
 Finance Code.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *