Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB521 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Averitt S.B. No. 521
 (In the Senate - Filed January 23, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and
 Homeland Security; March 9, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; March 9, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 521 By: Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas Department of Transportation's memorial sign
 program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 201.909, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to read as
 follows:
 (c) A sign designed and posted under this section shall
 include:
 (1) the phrase "Please Don't Drink and Drive";
 (2) the phrase "In Memory Of" and the name of one or
 more victims [the victim] in accordance with the commission rule
 [in whose memory the sign is placed]; and
 (3) the date of the accident that resulted in the
 victim's death.
 (c-1)  The sign may include the names of more than one victim
 so long as the total length of the names does not exceed one line of
 text.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *