Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB526 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson, Uresti S.B. No. 526
 (In the Senate - Filed January 23, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; April 15, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 15, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 526 By: Shapleigh


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to grants for federally qualified health centers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 31.017, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.017. FEDERALLY QUALIFIED HEALTH CENTERS.
 [(a)] The department may make grants to establish new or expand
 existing facilities and to support new or expanded services at
 facilities that can qualify as federally qualified health centers,
 as defined by 42 U.S.C. Section 1396d(l)(2)(B), in this state,
 including:
 (1) planning grants;
 (2) development grants;
 (3) capital improvement grants; and
 (4) grants for transitional operating support.
 [(b) This section expires September 1, 2009.]
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect August 31, 2009.
 * * * * *