81R3258 ALB-F By: Shapleigh S.B. No. 534 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the El Paso County Hospital District. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 281.021, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows: (e) The El Paso County Commissioners Court shall appoint a board composed of seven members. SECTION 2. Section 281.022, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows: (d) The members of the board of hospital managers of the El Paso County Hospital District serve staggered three-year terms, with as near as possible to one-third of the members' terms expiring each year. SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 281, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Sections 281.0221 and 281.031 to read as follows: Sec. 281.0221. TERM LIMIT. A member of the board of hospital managers of the El Paso County Hospital District may not serve more than two consecutive three-year terms and is not eligible for reappointment to the board until the second anniversary of the date the member's eligibility expires under this section. Sec. 281.031. REMOVAL OF BOARD MEMBER. (a) A member of the board of hospital managers of the El Paso County Hospital District is considered to have resigned the member's position if the member: (1) is absent from all the regularly scheduled board and committee meetings that the member is eligible to attend during a 90-day period; (2) is absent from more than half of the regularly scheduled board and committee meetings that the member is eligible to attend during a 12-month period; or (3) refuses to sign the board pledge not later than the 10th day after the date the member is appointed to the board. (b) A resignation under Subsection (a) is effective immediately on the date the absence or refusal prescribed by Subsection (a) occurs. SECTION 4. (a) This section applies to the appointment of the members of the board of hospital managers of the El Paso County Hospital District after the effective date of this Act, notwithstanding other law. (b) The members of the board appointed to succeed the members serving on the effective date of this Act whose terms expire March 31, 2010, shall serve three-year terms. (c) The members of the board appointed to succeed the members serving on the effective date of this Act whose terms expire March 31, 2011, shall draw lots to determine which two members shall serve a term expiring March 31, 2012, and which two members shall serve a term expiring March 31, 2014. Successor members appointed in 2012 and 2014 serve three-year terms. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.