Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB538 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Estes S.B. No. 538
 (In the Senate - Filed January 26, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 19, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; March 19, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the amount of wine certain wineries may sell directly to
 consumers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 16.01, Alcoholic
 Beverage Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) Except as provided by Section 16.011, the holder of a
 winery permit may:
 (1) manufacture, bottle, label, and package wine
 containing not more than 24 percent alcohol by volume;
 (2) manufacture and import grape brandy for fortifying
 purposes only and to be used only on his licensed premises;
 (3) sell wine in this state to or buy wine from permit
 holders authorized to purchase and sell wine, including holders of
 wholesaler's permits, winery permits, and wine bottler's permits;
 (4) sell wine to ultimate consumers:
 (A) for consumption on the winery premises; or
 (B) in unbroken packages for off-premises
 consumption in an amount not to exceed 55,000 [35,000] gallons
 annually;
 (5) sell the wine outside this state to qualified
 persons;
 (6) blend wines; and
 (7) dispense free wine for consumption on the winery
 premises.
 SECTION 2. Section 54.02, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.02. PROHIBITED ACTIVITIES. The holder of an
 out-of-state winery direct shipper's permit may not:
 (1) sell or ship wine to a minor;
 (2) deliver wine to a consumer using a carrier that
 does not hold a carrier's permit under this code;
 (3) deliver more than three gallons of wine within any
 30-day period to the same consumer in this state; or
 (4) sell to ultimate consumers more than 55,000
 [35,000] gallons of wine annually.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *