Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB542 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 542


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of money from the Texas emerging technology fund
 for the research and development of clean energy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 490, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 490.1027 to read as follows:
 Sec. 490.1027.  USE OF MONEY FOR RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT OF
 CERTAIN ENERGY-RELATED INITIATIVES.  (a)  The governor, lieutenant
 governor, and speaker of the house of representatives shall ensure
 that all the money distributed from the fund for the state fiscal
 biennium beginning September 1, 2009, and ending August 31, 2011,
 less any amounts awarded for biotechnology, medicine, and life
 sciences during the biennium ending August 31, 2009, and less any
 amounts necessary to administer the fund under Section 490.055,
 will be used as provided by Subchapter D, E, or F for the research
 and development of:
 (1) low carbon fuels;
 (2)  low carbon electric generation technologies
 including energy efficiency, renewable energy, and electricity
 storage; and
 (3) carbon emissions mitigation strategies.
 (b)  To the extent of a conflict between this section and
 Section 490.302 or another provision of this chapter, this section
 controls.
 (c) This section expires January 1, 2012.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.