Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB546 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS     Senate Research Center S.B. 546  By: Fraser  Business & Commerce  3/20/2009  As Filed     AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Currently, Section 39.905 (Goal for Energy Efficiency), Utilities Code, provides a goal for utilities to meet for implementing energy efficiency. As a result of H.B. 3693, 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, the Public Utilities Commission (PUC) conducted a study to determine the amount of energy efficiency utilities could feasibly obtain. The report detailing those amounts was released at the end of 2008.   As proposed,  S.B. 546 implements the energy efficiency standards recommended in the report conducted by the PUC.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Section 39.905(a), Utilities Code, as follows:   (a) Provides that it is the goal of the legislature that each electric utility will provide, through market-based standard offer programs or limited, targeted, market-transformation programs, incentives sufficient for retail electric providers and competitive energy service providers to acquire additional cost-effective energy efficiency for residential and commercial customers equivalent to at least 30 percent of the electric utility's annual growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by December 31, 2010, and 50 percent of the electric utility's annual growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by December 31, 2015, and requires that, notwithstanding Subdivision (3), rather than Subsection (a)(3), electric utilities continue to make available, at 2007 funding and participation levels, any load management standard offer programs developed for industrial customers and implemented prior to May 1, 2007. Makes a nonsubstantive change.   SECTION 2. Repealer: Subsection (b-2) (relating to a cost-effective energy efficiency study), Section 39.905, and Section 39.913 (Combining Certain Reports), Utilities Code.   SECTION 3. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009. 

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 546

 By: Fraser

 Business & Commerce

 3/20/2009

 As Filed

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Currently, Section 39.905 (Goal for Energy Efficiency), Utilities Code, provides a goal for utilities to meet for implementing energy efficiency. As a result of H.B. 3693, 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, the Public Utilities Commission (PUC) conducted a study to determine the amount of energy efficiency utilities could feasibly obtain. The report detailing those amounts was released at the end of 2008.

 

As proposed,  S.B. 546 implements the energy efficiency standards recommended in the report conducted by the PUC.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Section 39.905(a), Utilities Code, as follows:

 

(a) Provides that it is the goal of the legislature that each electric utility will provide, through market-based standard offer programs or limited, targeted, market-transformation programs, incentives sufficient for retail electric providers and competitive energy service providers to acquire additional cost-effective energy efficiency for residential and commercial customers equivalent to at least 30 percent of the electric utility's annual growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by December 31, 2010, and 50 percent of the electric utility's annual growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by December 31, 2015, and requires that, notwithstanding Subdivision (3), rather than Subsection (a)(3), electric utilities continue to make available, at 2007 funding and participation levels, any load management standard offer programs developed for industrial customers and implemented prior to May 1, 2007. Makes a nonsubstantive change.

 

SECTION 2. Repealer: Subsection (b-2) (relating to a cost-effective energy efficiency study), Section 39.905, and Section 39.913 (Combining Certain Reports), Utilities Code.

 

SECTION 3. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009.