Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB546 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Fraser S.B. No. 546


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the state goal for energy efficiency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 39.905, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (h), (i), and (j) to
 read as follows:
 (a) It is the goal of the legislature that:
 (1) electric utilities will administer energy
 efficiency incentive programs in a market-neutral,
 nondiscriminatory manner but will not offer underlying competitive
 services;
 (2) all customers, in all customer classes, will have
 a choice of and access to energy efficiency alternatives and other
 choices from the market that allow each customer to reduce energy
 consumption, peak demand, or energy costs;
 (3) each electric utility will provide, through
 market-based standard offer programs, [or] limited, targeted,
 market-transformation programs, or programs that address the major
 barriers to energy efficiency, incentives sufficient for retail
 electric providers and competitive energy service providers to
 acquire additional cost-effective energy efficiency for
 residential and commercial customers equivalent to at least:
 (A) 10 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2007;
 (B) 15 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2008, provided that the electric utility's program
 expenditures for 2008 funding may not be greater than 75 percent
 above the utility's program budget for 2007 for residential and
 commercial customers, as included in the April 1, 2006, filing;
 [and]
 (C) 20 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2009, provided that the electric utility's program
 expenditures for 2009 funding may not be greater than 150 percent
 above the utility's program budget for 2007 for residential and
 commercial customers, as included in the April 1, 2006, filing;
 (D)  the lower of 30 percent of the electric
 utility's annual growth in demand or 0.3 percent of the total peak
 demand of residential and commercial customers by December 31,
 2012, provided that the average cost of the programs charged by the
 electric utility to residential and commercial customers is not
 more than 25 cents per megawatt hour; and
 (E)  the lower of 50 percent of the electric
 utility's annual growth in demand or 0.7 percent of the total peak
 demand of residential and commercial customers by December 31,
 2016, provided that the average cost of the programs charged by the
 electric utility to residential and commercial customers is not
 more than 35 cents per megawatt hour;
 (4) each electric utility in the ERCOT region shall
 use its best efforts to encourage and facilitate the involvement of
 the region's retail electric providers in the delivery of
 efficiency programs and demand response programs under this
 section;
 (5) retail electric providers in the ERCOT region, and
 electric utilities outside of the ERCOT region, shall provide
 customers with energy efficiency educational materials; [and]
 (6) notwithstanding Subdivision (3) [Subsection
 (a)(3)], electric utilities shall continue to make available, at
 2007 funding and participation levels, any load management standard
 offer programs developed for industrial customers and implemented
 prior to May 1, 2007; and
 (7)  for an electric utility operating outside of ERCOT
 in areas of this state that were included in the Western Electricity
 Coordinating Council on January 1, 2009, the utility may continue
 to provide standard offer programs, limited, targeted
 market-transformation programs, or programs that address the major
 barriers to energy efficiency as required by Subdivision (3) or may
 provide energy efficiency programs and measures directly to a
 customer class.
 (h)  If the commission finds that an electric utility is
 unable to meet the goals specified in this section due to the
 establishment of new building energy codes; new appliance
 standards; federal funding of conservation, weatherization, and
 energy efficiency programs; or other factors unique to a particular
 utility, the commission may establish alternative goals for the
 utility, subject to the average rate impact limitations listed in
 Subsection (a)(3).
 (i)  In the event the federal government establishes
 national mandates, requirements, or goals for energy efficiency,
 the commission may suspend the goals in this section if it finds
 that the maintenance of a separate state requirement is duplicative
 or more costly than the suspension of the requirement.
 (j)  In the event funding is not provided for customer
 education efforts under Section 39.903(e)(2) at a level sufficient
 to allow the commission to adequately inform customers of the
 programs authorized by this section, electric utilities may conduct
 advertising or other outreach activities to retail customers if
 insufficient demand for incentives exists in the utility's service
 area. Outreach funds shall not be included in the average rate
 impact cap provided by this section. The commission shall approve
 the amount of funds to be expended in outreach efforts and the
 electric utility's plan for the activities to ensure that the
 activities are coordinated with other customer education
 initiatives of the commission.
 SECTION 2. Section 39.905, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (k) and (l) to read as follows:
 (k)  An electric utility that was not subject to this section
 on January 1, 2009, shall be subject to the energy efficiency goals
 established in this section on a phased-in basis, as prescribed by
 the commission, starting from the effective date of the final rates
 from the first rate case filed by the electric utility with the
 commission after January 1, 2010.
 (l)  Notwithstanding any other law, this section shall apply
 to every electric utility as defined by Section 31.002.
 SECTION 3. Subdivision (1), Subsection (a), Section
 388.005, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (1) "Institution of higher education" includes an
 institution of higher education as defined by Section 61.003,
 Education Code, and a private institution of higher education that
 receives direct funding from the state for general operating
 purposes.
 SECTION 4. Section 388.005, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  A private or independent institution of higher
 education as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code, that does
 not receive direct funding from the state for general operating
 purposes may seek and receive advice and assistance from the State
 Energy Conservation Office concerning energy conservation measures
 to reduce electricity consumption by the existing facilities of the
 institution.
 SECTION 5. The following provisions of the Utilities Code
 are repealed:
 (1) Subsection (b-2), Section 39.905; and
 (2) Section 39.913.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.