Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB563 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Jackson S.B. No. 563
 (In the Senate - Filed January 28, 2009; February 23, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 15, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 2; April 15, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a candidate as an incumbent on a
 primary ballot.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 172, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 172.0851 to read as follows:
 Sec. 172.0851.  DESIGNATION OF INCUMBENCY FOR CANDIDATES.
 For each office that appears on the primary election ballot or a
 runoff primary election ballot, the ballot must indicate a
 candidate who is an incumbent for that office adjacent to the
 candidate's name in a manner prescribed by the secretary of state.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *