Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB571 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 571
 (In the Senate - Filed January 28, 2009; February 23, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 30, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 30, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a crematory establishment's authority to accept for
 cremation unidentified human remains.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 716.101, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 716.101. UNIDENTIFIED HUMAN REMAINS. (a)  Except as
 provided by Subsection (b), a [A] crematory establishment may not
 accept for cremation unidentified human remains.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, a
 crematory establishment may accept for cremation unidentified
 human remains from a county on the order of:
 (1) the county commissioners court; or
 (2) a court located in the county.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *