Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB575 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Davis, Nelson S.B. No. 575
 (In the Senate - Filed January 28, 2009; February 23, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 30, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 30, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the time for dissolution of crime control and
 prevention districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsections (a) and (b), Section 363.301, Local
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) The district is dissolved on the first uniform election
 date that occurs after the fifth anniversary of the date the
 district began to levy taxes for district purposes if the district
 has not held a continuation or dissolution referendum.
 (b) The district is dissolved on the first uniform election
 date that occurs after the fifth anniversary of the date of the most
 recent continuation or dissolution referendum.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *