Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB575 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 575


 AN ACT
 relating to the time for dissolution of crime control and
 prevention districts and to certain taxes imposed by such districts
 or by fire control, prevention, and emergency medical services
 districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsections (a) and (b), Section 363.301, Local
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) The district is dissolved on the first uniform election
 date that occurs after the fifth anniversary of the date the
 district began to levy taxes for district purposes if the district
 has not held a continuation or dissolution referendum.
 (b) The district is dissolved on the first uniform election
 date that occurs after the fifth anniversary of the date of the most
 recent continuation or dissolution referendum.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 321, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 321.1055 to read as follows:
 Sec. 321.1055.  IMPOSITION OF FIRE CONTROL OR CRIME CONTROL
 DISTRICT TAX ON THE RESIDENTIAL USE OF GAS AND ELECTRICITY.
 (a)  This section applies to a fire control, prevention, and
 emergency medical services district or crime control and prevention
 district located in all or part of a municipality that imposes a tax
 on the residential use of gas and electricity under Section
 321.105.
 (b)  The board of directors of a district to which this
 section applies may, by order or resolution adopted in a public
 hearing by a vote of a majority of the membership of the board and
 recorded in the district's minutes:
 (1)  impose a tax adopted under Section 321.106 or
 321.108, as applicable, on receipts from the sale, production,
 distribution, lease, or rental of, and the use, storage, or other
 consumption within the district of, gas and electricity for
 residential use;
 (2)  exempt from taxation the items described by
 Subdivision (1); or
 (3) reimpose the tax under Subdivision (1).
 (c)  A district that adopts an order or resolution under
 Subsection (b) shall:
 (1)  send a copy of the order or resolution to the
 comptroller by United States certified or registered mail;
 (2)  send a copy of the order or resolution and a copy
 of the district's boundaries to each gas and electric company whose
 customers are subject to the tax by United States certified or
 registered mail; and
 (3)  publish notice of the order or resolution in a
 newspaper of general circulation in the district.
 (d)  If the residential use of gas and electricity ceases to
 be taxable in the municipality in which a district is located, then
 the residential use of gas and electricity is not taxable by the
 district.
 (e)  The provisions of Sections 321.201 and 321.204 that
 govern the computation of municipal taxes on gas and electricity
 for residential use apply to the computation of district taxes on
 gas and electricity for residential use under this section.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (b), Section 321.3022, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) The comptroller on request shall provide to a
 municipality that has adopted a tax under this chapter information
 relating to the amount of tax paid to the municipality under this
 chapter during the preceding or current calendar year by each
 person doing business in an area, as defined by the municipality,
 that is part of:
 (1) an interlocal agreement;
 (2) a tax abatement agreement;
 (3) a reinvestment zone;
 (4) a tax increment financing district;
 (5) a revenue sharing agreement;
 (6) an enterprise zone;
 (7) a neighborhood empowerment zone;
 (8) a crime control and prevention district;
 (9)  a fire control, prevention, and emergency medical
 services district;
 (10) any other agreement, zone, or district similar to
 those listed in Subdivisions (1)-(9) [(1)-(7)]; or
 (11) [(9)] any area defined by the municipality for
 the purpose of economic forecasting.
 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act by the
 addition of Section 321.1055, Tax Code, and the amendment of
 Subsection (b), Section 321.3022, Tax Code, take effect January 1,
 2010.
 SECTION 5. Except as provided by Section 4 of this Act, this
 Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of
 all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39,
 Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the
 vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect
 September 1, 2009, except as provided by Section 4 of this Act.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 575 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 575 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 141,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor