S.B. No. 58 AN ACT relating to the administration of the Juvenile Justice Case Management System. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 58.403, Family Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 58.403. JUVENILE INFORMATION SYSTEM. (a) Through the adoption of an interlocal contract under Chapter 791, Government Code, with one or more counties, the [The] commission [in partnership with local counties] may participate in and assist counties in the creation, operation, and maintenance of a [statewide] system that is intended for statewide use to: (1) aid in processing the cases of children under this title; (2) facilitate the delivery of services to children in the juvenile justice system; (3) aid in the early identification of at-risk and delinquent children; and (4) facilitate cross-jurisdictional sharing of information related to juvenile offenders between authorized criminal and juvenile justice agencies and partner agencies. (b) The commission may use funds appropriated for the implementation of this section to pay costs incurred under an interlocal contract described by Subsection (a), including license fees, maintenance and operations costs, administrative costs, and any other costs specified in the interlocal contract. (c) The commission may provide training services to counties on the use and operation of a system created, operated, or maintained by one or more counties under Subsection (a). SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 58 passed the Senate on April 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 20, 2009, House granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2009, Senate adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 58 passed the House, with amendments, on May 11, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, two present not voting; May 20, 2009, House granted request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; May 29, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor