Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB591 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 27, 2009      TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB591 by Van de Putte (Relating to the establishment of an evidence-based youth development competitive grant pilot program.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB591, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($207,130) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 27, 2009





  TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB591 by Van de Putte (Relating to the establishment of an evidence-based youth development competitive grant pilot program.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB591 by Van de Putte (Relating to the establishment of an evidence-based youth development competitive grant pilot program.), As Introduced

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB591 by Van de Putte (Relating to the establishment of an evidence-based youth development competitive grant pilot program.), As Introduced

SB591 by Van de Putte (Relating to the establishment of an evidence-based youth development competitive grant pilot program.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB591, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($207,130) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB591, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($207,130) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 ($118,360)   2011 ($88,770)   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0    


2010 ($118,360)
2011 ($88,770)
2012 $0
2013 $0
2014 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromAppropriated Receipts666  Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromAppropriated Receipts666    2010 ($118,360) $0 $0   2011 ($88,770) ($88,770) $88,770   2012 $0 $0 $0   2013 $0 $0 $0   2014 $0 $0 $0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromAppropriated Receipts666  Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromAppropriated Receipts666    2010 ($118,360) $0 $0   2011 ($88,770) ($88,770) $88,770   2012 $0 $0 $0   2013 $0 $0 $0   2014 $0 $0 $0  


2010 ($118,360) $0 $0
2011 ($88,770) ($88,770) $88,770
2012 $0 $0 $0
2013 $0 $0 $0
2014 $0 $0 $0

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to create an evidence-based youth development competitive grant pilot program. The grant program must provide services to no more than 75 adolescents to assist them in making healthy and beneficial life choices. The grant program must be in Bexar County located in zip codes in which the school-age birth rate is at least three times the nation average, at least 90 percent of the student population is economically disadvantaged, and the dropout rate of grades 7 to 12 is greater than 5 percent.    The grant must target adolescents who are: at risk for becoming pregnant or causing an unplanned pregnancy or who already have a child; at risk for engaging or are engaging in delinquent behavior; are at risk of dropping out of school; live in foster care or in a facility operated by the state; or live in economically disadvantaged circumstances. The program must operate for not less than nine months or an academic school year.    The grant funds may only be used for administering the program, including site selection and required evaluation and quality monitoring; training and managing staff; paying staff salaries and expenses; and paying for program facilities and expenses.    No later than December 1, 2010 HHSC must submit a report to the legislature regarding the performance of each grant recipient with respect to providing evidence-based youth development program services, including the number of low-income adolescents served, and the number of adolescents who became pregnant or caused a pregnancy.    The bill would take effect September 1, 2009.  No later than December 1, 2009 HHSC must implement the grant program.  This subchapter would expire September 1, 2011.

The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to create an evidence-based youth development competitive grant pilot program. The grant program must provide services to no more than 75 adolescents to assist them in making healthy and beneficial life choices. The grant program must be in Bexar County located in zip codes in which the school-age birth rate is at least three times the nation average, at least 90 percent of the student population is economically disadvantaged, and the dropout rate of grades 7 to 12 is greater than 5 percent. 

 

The grant must target adolescents who are: at risk for becoming pregnant or causing an unplanned pregnancy or who already have a child; at risk for engaging or are engaging in delinquent behavior; are at risk of dropping out of school; live in foster care or in a facility operated by the state; or live in economically disadvantaged circumstances. The program must operate for not less than nine months or an academic school year. 

 

The grant funds may only be used for administering the program, including site selection and required evaluation and quality monitoring; training and managing staff; paying staff salaries and expenses; and paying for program facilities and expenses. 

 

No later than December 1, 2010 HHSC must submit a report to the legislature regarding the performance of each grant recipient with respect to providing evidence-based youth development program services, including the number of low-income adolescents served, and the number of adolescents who became pregnant or caused a pregnancy. 

 

The bill would take effect September 1, 2009.  No later than December 1, 2009 HHSC must implement the grant program.  This subchapter would expire September 1, 2011.

Methodology

HHSC estimates that $118,306 in General Revenue Funds would be needed in fiscal year 2010 and $88,770 in General Revenue Funds would be needed in fiscal year 2011.  HHSC estimates that $88,770 in Appropriated Receipts (gifts, grants and donations) would be collected and expended in fiscal year 2011 to assist in funding the grant program.  If TANF Federal Funds were available, the cost to General Revenue could be reduced, but these funds would need to be appropriated to the agency for this purpose.

HHSC estimates that $118,306 in General Revenue Funds would be needed in fiscal year 2010 and $88,770 in General Revenue Funds would be needed in fiscal year 2011.  HHSC estimates that $88,770 in Appropriated Receipts (gifts, grants and donations) would be collected and expended in fiscal year 2011 to assist in funding the grant program.  If TANF Federal Funds were available, the cost to General Revenue could be reduced, but these funds would need to be appropriated to the agency for this purpose.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission

529 Health and Human Services Commission

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, BM, MB

 JOB, CL, BM, MB