By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 598 (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2009; February 23, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources; April 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 14, 2009, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a pilot revolving loan program for retrofitting public school buildings with photovoltaic solar panels and associated energy efficiency improvements. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 2305, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 2305.0321 to read as follows: Sec. 2305.0321. PILOT REVOLVING LOAN PROGRAM FOR SOLAR ENERGY FOR SCHOOL BUILDINGS. (a) The energy office shall establish a pilot program under the loanstar revolving loan program to provide loans to pay the cost of installing photovoltaic solar panels on public school buildings and the cost of associated energy efficiency improvements to the buildings. The energy office shall allocate to the pilot program at least $4 million from the funds available to the loanstar revolving loan program. (b) The energy office by rule shall establish the terms under which a loan may be made under the pilot program, including the interest rate for repayment of pilot program loans. (c) Through the pilot program, the energy office shall offer to each school district the opportunity to apply for a loan to pay the cost of installing photovoltaic solar panels on at least one school building of the school district's choice and the cost of associated energy efficiency improvements to that building. The energy office by rule shall establish a procedure for determining which school districts qualify for a loan under the pilot program, including rules for selecting the school districts that will receive a loan if there is not sufficient money set aside for pilot program improvements at all school districts. (d) Each school district that receives a loan shall pay for the principal of and interest on the loan for each school building improvement primarily from the amount budgeted for the energy costs of the school at which the solar panels are installed. The school district may make additional payments of the principal of or interest on a loan from money rebated to it as compensation for electric energy generated by the solar panels or money received as a gift or grant for the purpose of paying the loan. (e) This section expires September 1, 2011, and the pilot program established under this section is dissolved on that date. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *