Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB620 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS     Senate Research Center S.B. 620 81R4750 TJS-D By: Shapleigh  Business & Commerce  3/19/2009  As Filed     AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Currently, Section 39.904 (Goal for Renewable Energy) of the Utilities Code sets a goal of 500 megawatts (MW) of non-wind electric generating capacity. While some portions of Texas are prime locations for wind-generated electricity, the majority of the state is much better suited for solar-related energy initiatives. Concentrating Solar Power (CSP) creates focused sunlight up to 10,000 times its initial intensity.   As proposed,  S.B. 620 increases the goal for non-wind renewable energy production from 500 MW to 1,500 MW by 2015. The bill also increases the targets for the cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state by a commensurate amount.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Sections 39.904(a) and (o), Utilities Code, as follows:   (a) Provides that it is the intent of the legislature that by January 1, 2015, an additional 6,000, rather than 5,000, megawatts of generating capacity from renewable energy technologies will have been installed in this state. Requires that the cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state total 6,880, rather than 5,880, megawatts by January 1, 2015, and requires the Public Utility Commission of Texas (PUC) to establish a target of 11,000, rather than 10,000, megawatts of installed renewable capacity by January 1, 2025. Requires that the cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state total 5,264 by January 1, 2011, rather than 2,280 megawatts by January 1, 2007, 3,272 megawatts by January 1, 2009, and 4,264 megawatts by January 1, 2011; 6,256, rather than 5,256, megawatts by January 1, 2013; and 6,880, rather than 5,880, megawatts by January 1, 2015. Requires PUC, of the renewable energy technology generating capacity installed to meet the goal of this subsection after September 1, 2005, to establish a target of having at least 1,500, rather than 500, megawatts of capacity from a renewable energy technology other than a source using wind energy by January 1, 2015.   (o) Authorizes PUC to establish a separate alternative compliance payment for the goal of 1,500, rather than 500, megawatts of capacity from renewable energy technologies other than wind energy.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009.     

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 620

81R4750 TJS-D By: Shapleigh

 Business & Commerce

 3/19/2009

 As Filed

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Currently, Section 39.904 (Goal for Renewable Energy) of the Utilities Code sets a goal of 500 megawatts (MW) of non-wind electric generating capacity. While some portions of Texas are prime locations for wind-generated electricity, the majority of the state is much better suited for solar-related energy initiatives. Concentrating Solar Power (CSP) creates focused sunlight up to 10,000 times its initial intensity.

 

As proposed,  S.B. 620 increases the goal for non-wind renewable energy production from 500 MW to 1,500 MW by 2015. The bill also increases the targets for the cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state by a commensurate amount.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Sections 39.904(a) and (o), Utilities Code, as follows:

 

(a) Provides that it is the intent of the legislature that by January 1, 2015, an additional 6,000, rather than 5,000, megawatts of generating capacity from renewable energy technologies will have been installed in this state. Requires that the cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state total 6,880, rather than 5,880, megawatts by January 1, 2015, and requires the Public Utility Commission of Texas (PUC) to establish a target of 11,000, rather than 10,000, megawatts of installed renewable capacity by January 1, 2025. Requires that the cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state total 5,264 by January 1, 2011, rather than 2,280 megawatts by January 1, 2007, 3,272 megawatts by January 1, 2009, and 4,264 megawatts by January 1, 2011; 6,256, rather than 5,256, megawatts by January 1, 2013; and 6,880, rather than 5,880, megawatts by January 1, 2015. Requires PUC, of the renewable energy technology generating capacity installed to meet the goal of this subsection after September 1, 2005, to establish a target of having at least 1,500, rather than 500, megawatts of capacity from a renewable energy technology other than a source using wind energy by January 1, 2015.

 

(o) Authorizes PUC to establish a separate alternative compliance payment for the goal of 1,500, rather than 500, megawatts of capacity from renewable energy technologies other than wind energy.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009.