Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB633 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 633
 (In the Senate - Filed February 2, 2009; February 23, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 9, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 9, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the number of counties or municipalities necessary to
 establish a regional drug court program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 469.0025, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) The commissioners courts of two [three] or more
 counties, or the governing bodies of two [three] or more
 municipalities, may elect to establish a regional drug court
 program under this chapter for the participating counties or
 municipalities.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *