Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB650 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 650
 (In the Senate - Filed February 4, 2009; February 23, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 20, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain peace officers commissioned by the Texas State
 Board of Pharmacy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Section 554.010, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) An employee commissioned as a peace officer under this
 subtitle has the powers, privileges, and immunities of a peace
 officer while carrying out duties as a peace officer under this
 subtitle[, except that the employee may not carry a firearm or make
 an arrest].
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *